Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 225 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1294 Week
» 1294 Month
» 68156 Year
» 1733532 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 66 m/e 05/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7066 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7225 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67225 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F605/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 05/1911
Withdrawal Mon 28/05/1956
Service Life 45 yrs , 28 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
MC   Melton Constable m/e 30/11/1949
30E   Colchester 5w/e 17/12/1955
     Withdrawn on 28/05/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   on 28/05/1956
WDN   w/e 28/05/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
10/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 66
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7066    
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7225    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67225    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (MC)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
28/05/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67225    

prev prev