Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 229 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1298 Week
» 1298 Month
» 68160 Year
» 1733536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 67 m/e 05/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7067 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7226 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67226 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F605/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 05/1911
Withdrawal Mon 14/11/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1911
YB   Yarmouth Beach on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 24/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 14/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC MEL   w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 13/12/1947
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   on 14/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 67
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7067    
10/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7226    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67226    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
14/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67226    

prev prev