Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 193 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 6819 Week
» 31653 Month
» 65985 Year
» 1731361 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 68 m/e 05/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7068 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7227 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67227 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F605/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 05/1911
Withdrawal Thu 08/05/1958
Service Life 47 yrs , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
KL   Kings Lynn 4w/e 27/11/1948
31D   South Lynn m/e 06/05/1950
31C   Kings Lynn 3w/e 31/05/1950
31D   South Lynn 4w/e 25/11/1950
31D   South Lynn m/e 30/11/1950
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 26/01/1952
31A   Cambridge 5w/e 16/02/1952
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 23/10/1954
31A   Cambridge 6w/e 25/12/1954
30A   Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955
30E   Colchester 3w/e 16/06/1956
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 31D South Lynn m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 23/06/1956
WDN   on 08/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1938 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/06/1958 Stratford MPD On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. SLS/195807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 68
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7068    
10/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1938 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7227    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67227    
27/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL)    
06/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to South Lynn (31D)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
08/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67227    

prev prev