Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 187 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1256 Week
» 1256 Month
» 68118 Year
» 1733494 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 69 m/e 06/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7069 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7228 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67228 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F606/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 06/1911
Withdrawal Mon 21/04/1958
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
MC   Melton Constable m/e 30/11/1949
MEL     w/e 10/12/1949
30A   Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955
30E   Colchester 5w/e 24/03/1956
30A   Stratford 4w/e 08/01/1958
     Withdrawn on 21/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEL   w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 30E Colchester 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   on 21/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 69
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7069    
10/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7228    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (MC)    
10/12/1949 Allocation      
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67228    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
21/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67228    

prev prev