Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17304 Week
» 70320 Month
» 189847 Year
» 3216700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1 |
m/e |
10/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7001 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7230 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67230 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A71 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/05/1958 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1958 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
10/11/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
13/05/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
25/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. |
SLS/194711 |
29/06/1958 |
Stratford MPD |
On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7001 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7230 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67230 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67230 |
|
|
12/1958 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|