Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 187 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1256 Week
» 1256 Month
» 68118 Year
» 1733494 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 1 m/e 10/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7001 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7230 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67230 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F610/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A71
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 10/1911
Withdrawal Tue 13/05/1958
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
LOW   Lowestoft w/e 07/02/1948
30A   Stratford 4w/e 17/11/1956
     Withdrawn on 13/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 10/11/1956
WDN   on 13/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
08/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/09/1947 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. SLS/194711
29/06/1958 Stratford MPD On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. SLS/195807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7001    
10/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7230    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67230    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67230    
12/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev