Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 229 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1298 Week
» 1298 Month
» 68160 Year
» 1733536 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7002 y/e c. 0
Great Eastern Railway 2 m/e 10/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7231 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67231 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F610/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A71
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 10/1911
Withdrawal Fri 14/03/1958
Service Life 46 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
LOW   Lowestoft w/e 07/02/1948
NOR   Norwich Thorpe m/e 30/11/1949
NOR   Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/12/1949
32C   Lowestoft w/e 09/07/1950
     Withdrawn on 14/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft w/e 09/07/1950
WDN   on 14/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
08/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/06/1958 Stratford MPD On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. SLS/195807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7002    
10/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 2
Built at Stratford Works
   
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7231    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67231    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
09/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
14/03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67231    

prev prev