Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 179 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1248 Week
» 1248 Month
» 68110 Year
» 1733486 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7003 y/e c. 0
Great Eastern Railway 3 m/e 11/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7232 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67232 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F611/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A71
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1911
Withdrawal Mon 14/11/1955
Service Life 44 yrs , 14 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester w/e 07/02/1948
LOW   Lowestoft w/e 21/02/1948
NOR   Norwich Thorpe m/e 07/1949
NOR   Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/07/1949
32C   Lowestoft 5w/e 23/06/1951
     Withdrawn on 14/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/07/1949
WDN   on 14/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7003    
11/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 3
Built at Stratford Works
   
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7232    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
21/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67232    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
14/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67232    

prev prev