Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1325 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14731 Week
» 67747 Month
» 187274 Year
» 3214127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7003 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
Great Eastern Railway |
3 |
m/e |
11/1911 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7232 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67232 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A71 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1911 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/11/1955 |
Service Life |
44 yrs , 14 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
16/07/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7003 |
|
|
11/1911 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 3 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7232 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
07/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67232 |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
16/07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
14/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67232 |
|
|