Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 779 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6310 Week
» 31144 Month
» 65476 Year
» 1730852 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7004 y/e c. 0
Great Eastern Railway 4 m/e 11/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7233 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67233 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F611/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A71
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1911
Withdrawal Tue 13/12/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1911
YB   Yarmouth Beach on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
LOW   Lowestoft w/e 08/10/1949
YB   Yarmouth Beach w/e 21/01/1950
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 24/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 13/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   on 13/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
11/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7004    
11/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 4
Built at Stratford Works
   
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7233    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
08/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67233    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
13/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67233    

prev prev