Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 241 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 6867 Week
» 31701 Month
» 66033 Year
» 1731409 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7006 y/e c. 0
Great Eastern Railway 6 m/e 12/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7235 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67235 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F612/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A71
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1911
Withdrawal Mon 16/01/1956
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1911
YB   Yarmouth Beach on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 24/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 16/01/1956
30A   Stratford 5w/e 21/01/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   on 16/01/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7006    
12/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 6
Built at Stratford Works
   
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7235    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67235    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
16/01/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67235    
21/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    

prev prev