Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 447 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5922 Week
» 5922 Month
» 72784 Year
» 1738160 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7007 y/e c. 0
Great Eastern Railway 7 m/e 12/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7236 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67236 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F612/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A71
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1911
Withdrawal Wed 17/08/1955
Service Life 43 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1911
KL   Kings Lynn on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BURY     w/e 07/02/1948
31B   March 4w/e 19/01/1952
31B   March 4w/e 26/01/1952
31E   Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 13/12/1952
31E   Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 27/12/1952
     Withdrawn on 17/08/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 13/12/1947
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC BURY   w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 27/12/1952
WDN   on 17/08/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7007    
12/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 7
Built at Stratford Works
   
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7236    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL)    
07/02/1948 Allocation      
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67236    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
17/08/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67236    

prev prev