Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 4245 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17651 Week
» 70667 Month
» 190194 Year
» 3217047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7009 |
y/e |
c. 0 |
Great Eastern Railway |
9 |
m/e |
01/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7238 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
67238 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
S. Holden |
Class |
F6 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
A71 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 01/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/11/1955 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31E |
Bury St Edmunds |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
12/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7009 |
|
|
01/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 9 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7238 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67238 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
07/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67238 |
|
|