Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 459 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1367 Week
» 12512 Month
» 112297 Year
» 1777673 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7009 y/e c. 0
Great Eastern Railway 9 m/e 01/1912
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7238 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67238 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F601/1912
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A71
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 01/1912
Withdrawal Mon 07/11/1955
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 7 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1912
BSE   Bury St Edmunds on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
CAM   Cambridge m/e 07/1949
CAM   Cambridge m/e 30/11/1949
31E   Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 09/08/1952
31E   Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 20/06/1953
     Withdrawn on 07/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   on 07/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
12/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Renumbered Renumbered to 7009    
01/1912 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 9
Built at Stratford Works
   
10/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
12/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7238    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury St Edmunds (BSE)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 67238    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
07/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67238    

prev prev