Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 82 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6009 Week
» 4747 Month
» 419068 Year
» 1640633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1769 m/e 08/1894
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7248 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67248 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A177
To Service During 08/1894
Withdrawal Wed 17/12/1958
Service Life 64 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1894
TWD Tweedmouth on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52C Blaydon 4w/e 19/07/1952
54A Sunderland 4w/e 15/12/1956
50F Malton 4w/e 08/01/1958
   Withdrawn on 17/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC DUR   3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 50F Malton 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   on 17/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1769
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7248    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tweedmouth (TWD)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67248    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
08/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Malton (50F)    
17/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67248    

prev prev