Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1772 m/e 04/1895
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7252 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67252 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A185
To Service During 04/1895
Withdrawal w/e Mon 10/11/1952
Service Life 57 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1895
SUN Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B Heaton 4w/e 21/07/1951
52A Gateshead 5w/e 21/06/1952
52B Heaton 4w/e 19/07/1952
52C Blaydon 5w/e 23/08/1952
   Withdrawn w/e 10/11/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 09/08/1952
WDN   w/e 10/11/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1772
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7252    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67252    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
21/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
10/11/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 67252    

prev prev