Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2185 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15591 Week
» 68607 Month
» 188134 Year
» 3214987 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1840 |
m/e |
04/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7254 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
67254 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A185 |
To Service |
During 04/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 03/12/1957 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1895 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1840 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7254 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67254 |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bridlington (53D) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
03/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67254 |
|
|