Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 33 Online
» 1265 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 24896 Week
» 89850 Month
» 292514 Year
» 3319367 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1795 |
m/e |
06/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7259 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67259 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A185 |
To Service |
During 06/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 17/12/1957 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
52C |
Blaydon |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1895 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1795 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
10/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7259 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67259 |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
18/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
17/12/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67259 |
|
|