Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 82 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6009 Week
» 4747 Month
» 419068 Year
» 1640633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1795 m/e 06/1895
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7259 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67259 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A185
To Service During 06/1895
Withdrawal Tue 17/12/1957
Service Life 62 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1895
BLA Blaydon on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52A Gateshead 5w/e 24/04/1954
52C Blaydon 5w/e 18/12/1954
54A Sunderland 5w/e 17/12/1955
   Withdrawn on 17/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   on 17/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1895 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1795
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7259    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67259    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
18/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
17/12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67259    

prev prev