Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18191 Week
» 71207 Month
» 190734 Year
» 3217587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1778 |
m/e |
02/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7261 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
67261 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A201 |
To Service |
During 02/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 11/12/1958 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
53B |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1943 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1957 |
Newbiggin, Blyth And Monkseaton Branch |
G5 tanks 67261, 67281 an 67253 have been working on this branch during July and August. 67261 and 67281 have both been recently through Darlington Works for overhaul and repainting, 67261 having been reprieved from scrap. |
SLS/195709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1896 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1778 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
06/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7261 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (South) (SBH) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67261 |
|
|
18/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
11/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67261 |
|
|