Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 324 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6251 Week
» 4989 Month
» 419310 Year
» 1640875 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1881 m/e 11/1896
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7278 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67278 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A209
To Service During 11/1896
Withdrawal Tue 30/07/1957
Service Life 60 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1896
NEV Neville Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
SKN Stockton m/e 12/1949
51F West Auckland 5w/e 16/02/1952
51E Stockton 4w/e 15/11/1952
51C West Hartlepool 5w/e 24/07/1954
51J Northallerton 5w/e 18/12/1954
54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn on 30/07/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 06/03/1948
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 14/08/1954
ALLOC 51J Northallerton 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 5w/e 31/03/1956
WDN   on 30/07/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906
18/04/1953 Darlington Works Nos. 78006/7/8/9 are in traffic. Can anyone confirm that they carry 1952 plates? No. 46478 has been in for intermediate and repaint. Nos. 67291, 67303/31 an 62373 have been condemned. The old shed at Ferryhill has been demolished: since the closure-16 years ago-a few engines on stock have been stored there, the last being Nos. 67278, 62359 an 62365, taken away about two years ago. 'J21' No. 65070 has received a full repair. SLS/195306

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1896 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1881
Built at Darlington Works
   
11/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7278    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67278    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
24/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
18/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
30/07/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67278    

prev prev