Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 333 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6260 Week
» 4998 Month
» 419319 Year
» 1640884 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1916 m/e 06/1897
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7294 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 67294 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A218
To Service During 06/1897
Withdrawal Tue 15/01/1957
Service Life 59 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1897
SKN Stockton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 25/11/1950
54A Sunderland 4w/e 25/09/1954
52F Blyth (North) 5w/e 23/07/1955
54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn on 15/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AUK West Auckland w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool w/e 22/10/1950
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC DUR   3w/e 21/04/1956
WDN   on 15/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1897 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1916
Built at Darlington Works
   
06/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7294    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockton (SKN)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67294    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
15/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67294    

prev prev