Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 590 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5061 Week
» 16107 Month
» 16107 Year
» 1681483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2090 m/e 12/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7319 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67319 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A281
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Tue 03/12/1957
Service Life 57 yrs , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1900
NEV Neville Hill on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50F Malton 5w/e 23/04/1955
   Withdrawn on 03/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 50F Malton 4w/e 23/04/1955
WDN   on 03/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2090
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7319    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67319    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Malton (50F)    
03/12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67319    

prev prev