Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2091 m/e 12/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7320 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 67320 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A281
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Thu 20/11/1958
Service Life 57 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1900
SBH Blyth (South) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52A Gateshead 4w/e 30/06/1950
52C Blaydon 5w/e 24/04/1954
52A Gateshead 5w/e 18/12/1954
52C Blaydon 4w/e 19/03/1955
52F Blyth (North) 5w/e 22/10/1955
54A Sunderland 5w/e 19/01/1957
   Withdrawn on 20/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead w/e 31/05/1950
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC DUR   4w/e 26/01/1957
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
WDN   on 20/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2091
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7320    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (South) (SBH)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67320    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
18/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
20/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67320    

prev prev