Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 347 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6274 Week
» 5012 Month
» 419333 Year
» 1640898 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 2092 m/e 12/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7321 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67321 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A281
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal Mon 07/01/1957
Service Life 56 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1900
HLB Hull Botanic Gardens on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
53D Bridlington 4w/e 20/06/1953
53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 19/12/1953
54A Sunderland 5w/e 17/12/1955
   Withdrawn on 07/01/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 53D Bridlington 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   on 07/01/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
01/1939 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2092
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1939 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7321    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67321    
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bridlington (53D)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
07/01/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67321    

prev prev