Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2580 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15986 Week
» 69002 Month
» 188529 Year
» 3215382 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
2094 |
m/e |
12/1900 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7323 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
67323 |
m/e |
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A281 |
To Service |
During 12/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/12/1958 |
Service Life |
58 yrs , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
ALLOC |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
08/12/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1900 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2094 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
05/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7323 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67323 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
08/12/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67323 |
|
|