|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 149 Built at Darlington Works |
||
06/1929 | Modification | Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted | ||
02/1939 | Modification | Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7338 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
05/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67338 | ||
23/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
17/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
27/08/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 67338 |