Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 383 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6310 Week
» 5048 Month
» 419369 Year
» 1640934 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 427 m/e 10/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7344 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 67344 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 10/1901
Withdrawal Mon 27/02/1956
Service Life 54 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 10/1901
NLN Northallerton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
51A Darlington 5w/e 23/06/1951
51J Northallerton 5w/e 16/02/1952
51F West Auckland 4w/e 15/11/1952
54A Sunderland 4w/e 14/02/1953
   Withdrawn on 27/02/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 51J Northallerton 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   on 27/02/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1928 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 427
Built at Darlington Works
   
10/1928 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7344    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Northallerton (NLN)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67344    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
27/02/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67344    

prev prev