Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2041 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19844 Week
» 72860 Month
» 192387 Year
» 3219240 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
435 |
m/e |
11/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7346 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67346 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A--- |
To Service |
During 11/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/02/1957 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
51A |
Darlington |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
ALLOC |
51E |
Stockton |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
ALLOC |
50F |
Malton |
3w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/02/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1928 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 435 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
12/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7346 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Northallerton (NLN) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67346 |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|
15/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
11/02/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67346 |
|
|