Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2766 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16172 Week
» 69188 Month
» 188715 Year
» 3215568 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
436 |
m/e |
11/1901 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7347 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
67347 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
G5 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
A--- |
To Service |
During 11/1901 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 26/03/1956 |
Service Life |
54 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1901 |
SBH |
|
Blyth (South) |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
54A |
|
Sunderland |
5w/e |
23/07/1955 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/03/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
54A |
Sunderland |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/03/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1901 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 436 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
07/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7347 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (South) (SBH) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67347 |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) |
|
|
26/03/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67347 |
|
|