Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 353 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6280 Week
» 5018 Month
» 419339 Year
» 1640904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 436 m/e 11/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7347 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 67347 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class G5
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number A---
To Service During 11/1901
Withdrawal Mon 26/03/1956
Service Life 54 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1901
SBH Blyth (South) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A Sunderland 5w/e 23/07/1955
   Withdrawn on 26/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   on 26/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1901 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 436
Built at Darlington Works
   
07/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7347    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blyth (South) (SBH)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67347    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
26/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67347    

prev prev