Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19936 Week
» 72952 Month
» 192479 Year
» 3219332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
319 |
m/e |
06/1879 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8428 |
|
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68428 |
|
07/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Fletcher |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
NER/LNER/BR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 06/1879 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/02/1955 |
Service Life |
75 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1879 |
BLA |
|
Blaydon |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
SBH |
|
Blyth (South) |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
52B |
|
Heaton |
4w/e |
19/12/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/02/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BLA |
Blaydon |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
SBH |
Blyth (South) |
w/e |
04/12/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1879 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 319 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8428 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
04/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (South) (SBH) |
|
|
07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68428 |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
07/02/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68428 |
|
|