Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3187 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16593 Week
» 69609 Month
» 189136 Year
» 3215989 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1461 |
m/e |
08/1880 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8435 |
|
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68435 |
|
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Fletcher |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
NER/LNER/BR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Gateshead Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
To Service |
During 08/1880 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 08/10/1958 |
Service Life |
78 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1880 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1461 Built at Gateshead Works |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8435 |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68435 |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
14/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
08/10/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68435 |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockton (51E) |
|
|