|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 27/09/1923 | 13/11/1923 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1925 | 29/09/1925 | 105 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/10/1925 | 09/11/1925 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1926 | 16/07/1926 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1927 | 17/08/1927 | 128 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/10/1929 | 23/12/1929 | 56 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/01/1930 | 15/01/1930 | 9 days | Painting | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1932 | 20/09/1932 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1934 | 07/09/1934 | 166 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1936 | 21/01/1937 | 108 days | General | Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1939 | 09/09/1939 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1943 | 03/05/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1945 | 21/12/1945 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1948 | 25/03/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 24745 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1950 | 01/04/1950 | 55 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2821 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to BR 69856 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1952 | 03/04/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24723 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24703 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1954 | 17/03/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1954 | 01/04/1954 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1956 | 10/02/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24752 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1963 | 25/10/1963 | 36 days | Heavy |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Borough Gardens) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2149 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
27/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1923. Dep: 13/11/1923. | ||
17/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1925. Dep: 29/09/1925. | ||
29/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1925. Dep: 09/11/1925. | ||
07/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1926. Dep: 16/07/1926. | ||
12/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1927. Dep: 17/08/1927. | ||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
29/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1929. Dep: 23/12/1929. | ||
07/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Painting) - Arr: 07/01/1930. Dep: 15/01/1930. | ||
07/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1932. Dep: 20/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
26/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 26/03/1934. Dep: 07/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1219 (Diagram 63) |
||
17/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
06/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1936. Dep: 21/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1316 (Diagram 63) |
||
17/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
17/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN) | ||
05/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. | ||
04/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1939. Dep: 09/09/1939. | ||
26/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1943. Dep: 03/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2468 (Diagram 63A) |
||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 21/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2661 (Diagram 63A) |
||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9856 | ||
12/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1948. Dep: 25/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24745 (Diagram 63B) |
||
28/03/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to E9856 | ||
06/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 2821 (Diagram 63C) Renumbered to BR 69856 |
||
10/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1952. Dep: 03/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24723 (Diagram 63B) |
||
15/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24703 (Diagram 63B) |
||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954. | ||
22/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 01/04/1954. | ||
12/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1956. Dep: 10/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24752 (Diagram 63B) |
||
12/1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69856 from West Auckland (51F) | ||
20/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/09/1963. Dep: 25/10/1963. |