Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 2150 m/e 01/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9857   27/10/1946
British Railways 69857   09/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H101/1914
A814/06/1935
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 01/1914 to Saltburn (SALT)
Withdrawal Fri 05/02/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 02/1960
Service Life 46 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington for cutting up 5/2/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SALT Saltburn (New) m/e 01/1914
BLA Blaydon on 28/05/1928
MID Middlesbrough on 14/06/1935
BLA Blaydon on 17/01/1939
SUN Sunderland on 07/11/1948
   Withdrawn on 05/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 13/11/1948
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   w/e 05/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1914 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D265)
09/10/1931 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number 2373)
10/08/1937 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1267)
01/02/1940 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1251)
02/12/1942 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2453)
11/08/1945 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 117)
09/07/1948 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3898)
21/04/1951 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24708)
10/10/1953 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24685)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 03/09/1923 19/11/1923 78 days General  
Darlington Works 15/09/1925 22/12/1925 99 days General  
Darlington Works 09/09/1927 25/11/1927 78 days General  
Gateshead Works 23/09/1929 12/11/1929 51 days General  
Gateshead Works 04/09/1931 09/10/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 19/09/1933 26/10/1933 38 days General  
Darlington Works 11/03/1935 14/06/1935 96 days Rebuilding  
Darlington Works 08/06/1937 10/08/1937 64 days General
Boiler number D1267 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 12/08/1937 24/08/1937 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/12/1939 01/02/1940 34 days General
Boiler number D1251 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1941 29/11/1941 27 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 26/10/1942 02/12/1942 38 days General
Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 28/03/1944 25/04/1944 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 19/03/1945 11/08/1945 146 days General
Boiler number 117 (Diagram 63A)
 
Gateshead Works 21/11/1946 06/12/1946 16 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 01/01/1948 23/03/1948 83 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 03/06/1948 09/07/1948 37 days General
Boiler number 3898 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69857
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1951 21/04/1951 33 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 24708 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 11/09/1953 10/10/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 24685 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 12/10/1953 13/10/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/08/1954 23/09/1954 43 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 04/10/1956 07/11/1956 35 days Light Intermediate  
Darlington Works 22/11/1957 06/12/1957 15 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
15/09/1956 Sunderland MPD On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. SLS/195611
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1914 To Service      
28/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
14/06/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
17/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9857    
07/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
05/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69857 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev