|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 13/03/1923 | 29/06/1923 | 109 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1925 | 28/05/1925 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1927 | 20/09/1927 | 72 days | General | Boiler number D254 (Diagram 63) |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/07/1929 | 05/09/1929 | 59 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/03/1931 | 25/03/1931 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/10/1931 | 13/11/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2374 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1933 | 17/11/1933 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1936 | 11/06/1936 | 93 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1254 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1938 | 15/12/1938 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1941 | 30/10/1941 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3067 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/08/1948 | 10/09/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 69858 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1949 | 08/07/1949 | 31 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1949 | 13/07/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/09/1949 | 09/11/1949 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1951 | 24/10/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24697 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1954 | 30/01/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1957 | 30/03/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24686 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/07/1957 | 16/08/1957 | 38 days | Light Casual | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1957 | Sunderland MPD | This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. | SLS/195711 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (Borough Gardens) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2151 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
13/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1923. Dep: 29/06/1923. | ||
01/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
07/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
10/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1925. Dep: 28/05/1925. | ||
11/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1927. Dep: 20/09/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D254 (Diagram 63) |
||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
09/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1929. Dep: 05/09/1929. | ||
19/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1931. Dep: 25/03/1931. | ||
09/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1931. Dep: 13/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2374 (Diagram 63) |
||
03/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1933. Dep: 17/11/1933. | ||
11/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 11/03/1936. Dep: 11/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1254 (Diagram 63) |
||
11/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
05/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1938. Dep: 15/12/1938. | ||
17/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
17/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1941. Dep: 30/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3067 (Diagram 63B) |
||
07/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3031 (Diagram 63B) |
||
12/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9858 | ||
17/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B) |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
25/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1948. Dep: 10/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69858 |
||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 08/07/1949. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 3048 (Diagram 63B) |
||
11/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1949. Dep: 13/07/1949. | ||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 09/11/1949. | ||
24/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24713 (Diagram 63B) |
||
22/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/10/1951. Dep: 24/10/1951. | ||
15/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24697 (Diagram 63B) |
||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 30/01/1954. | ||
29/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
28/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24686 (Diagram 63B) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
10/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
10/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69858 from Sunderland (52G) |