|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/08/1923 | 30/11/1923 | 113 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1924 | 19/03/1924 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1924 | 14/07/1924 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1926 | 05/02/1926 | -259 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1928 | 10/08/1928 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1930 | 14/07/1930 | 81 days | General | Boiler number D300 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1931 | 18/01/1932 | 64 days | General | Boiler number D1107 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1934 | 19/05/1934 | 75 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number D1313 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1936 | 22/05/1936 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1936 | 06/06/1936 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1936 | 09/07/1936 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1939 | 24/03/1939 | 65 days | General | Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1941 | 08/10/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1942 | 04/02/1942 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1942 | 17/08/1942 | 39 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1944 | 29/03/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2467 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9879 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1948 | 30/01/1948 | 21 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR E9879 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1948 | 26/11/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69879 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1951 | 17/11/1951 | 27 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24758 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1951 | 21/11/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1955 | 04/06/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24715 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1922 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1500 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
10/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1923. Dep: 30/11/1923. | ||
07/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1924. Dep: 19/03/1924. | ||
13/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1924. Dep: 14/07/1924. | ||
23/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1926. Dep: 05/02/1926. | ||
31/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1928. Dep: 10/08/1928. | ||
25/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1930. Dep: 14/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D300 (Diagram 63) |
||
16/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1931. Dep: 18/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1107 (Diagram 63) |
||
06/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 06/03/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1313 (Diagram 63) |
||
29/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/07/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
16/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1936. Dep: 22/05/1936. | ||
26/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1936. Dep: 06/06/1936. | ||
18/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1936. Dep: 09/07/1936. | ||
19/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1939. Dep: 24/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63) |
||
01/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
20/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1941. Dep: 08/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2373 (Diagram 63) |
||
28/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1942. Dep: 04/02/1942. | ||
10/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1942. Dep: 17/08/1942. | ||
01/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1944. Dep: 29/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2664 (Diagram 63A) |
||
06/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2467 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9879 |
||
10/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 30/01/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR E9879 |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
27/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1948. Dep: 26/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2457 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69879 |
||
17/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
23/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
22/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24758 (Diagram 63B) |
||
19/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1951. Dep: 21/11/1951. | ||
03/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1955. Dep: 04/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24715 (Diagram 63B) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
20/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69879 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |