Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 91 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6018 Week
» 4756 Month
» 419077 Year
» 1640642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Pre Grouping 1524 m/e 08/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9883   15/09/1946
British Railways 69883   27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer V. Raven / N. Gresley
Class A8
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
H108/1921
A809/08/1934
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 08/1921 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Wed 01/06/1960 off Sunderland (52G)
Scrapping During 06/1960
Service Life 38 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 1/6/60

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) m/e 08/1921
Dar Middleton in Teesdale on 16/07/1938
SALT Saltburn on 22/03/1939
51E Stockton on 11/06/1950
51D Middlesbrough on 05/10/1952
51J Northallerton on 09/11/1952
51D Middlesbrough on 01/03/1953
51E Stockton on 07/06/1953
51D Middlesbrough on 20/09/1953
51C West Hartlepool on 14/02/1954
54a Durham on 15/09/1957
52G Sunderland on 07/12/1958
   Withdrawn on 01/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51E Stockton on 11/06/1950
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 51J Northallerton 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 5w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC DUR   4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 54A Sunderland 4w/e 27/12/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 30/05/1959
WDN   on 01/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1921 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1219)
09/08/1934 Diagram 63 boiler fitted (number D1287)
05/09/1940 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 116)
10/04/1943 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2662)
12/09/1947 Diagram 63A boiler fitted (number 2465)
27/08/1949 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 3059)
06/09/1951 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24710)
16/10/1954 Diagram 63B boiler fitted (number 24767)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 10/12/1923 22/02/1924 75 days General  
Darlington Works 05/03/1924 21/03/1924 17 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/01/1925 19/02/1925 38 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 12/10/1925 31/12/1925 81 days General  
Darlington Works 03/04/1928 14/06/1928 73 days General  
Darlington Works 24/09/1928 25/10/1928 32 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/07/1929 18/07/1929 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 27/12/1929 17/02/1930 53 days General  
Darlington Works 29/01/1931 20/02/1931 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/04/1932 18/08/1932 130 days General  
Darlington Works 29/09/1932 19/10/1932 21 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/03/1934 09/08/1934 141 days Rebuilding
Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63)
 
Darlington Works 24/08/1934 07/09/1934 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/04/1936 13/06/1936 53 days General
Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1937 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 25/04/1938 09/06/1938 46 days General  
Darlington Works 09/06/1938 21/06/1938 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/07/1940 05/09/1940 46 days General
Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 08/03/1943 10/04/1943 34 days General
Boiler number 2662 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 02/02/1945 07/06/1945 126 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 28/06/1947 12/09/1947 77 days General
Boiler number 2465 (Diagram 63A)
 
Darlington Works 04/08/1949 27/08/1949 24 days General
Positive lub. drive fitted
Boiler number 3059 (Diagram 63B)
Renumbered to BR 69883
 
Darlington Works 29/08/1949 02/09/1949 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/09/1949 26/09/1949 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/11/1949 17/11/1949 9 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/07/1951 06/09/1951 44 days General
Boiler number 24710 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 10/09/1951 12/09/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/09/1954 16/10/1954 34 days General
Boiler number 24767 (Diagram 63B)
 
Darlington Works 15/01/1957 11/02/1957 28 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 17/06/1957 02/08/1957 47 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 12/08/1957 14/08/1957 3 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1957 Sunderland MPD This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. SLS/195711
13/12/1958 Durham MPD This shed (sub to Sunderland) was closed as from 13th December, 1958, and its two remaining A8s 69873/83 transferred to store at Sunderland. Banking at Durham is now performed by a V1/3 which comes daily from Sunderland. SLS/195902
31/05/1959 Class A8 4-6-2T (Sunderland) All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. SLS/195907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1921 To Service      
16/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Middleton in Teesdale (Dar)    
22/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9883    
11/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
09/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Northallerton (51J)    
01/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
07/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
14/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Durham (54a)    
07/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69883 from Sunderland (52G)    

prev prev