|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/08/1923 | 25/10/1923 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1924 | 08/09/1924 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1926 | 08/04/1926 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1928 | 12/05/1928 | 97 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1929 | 19/07/1929 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1930 | 23/05/1930 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1932 | 21/04/1932 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1933 | 25/08/1933 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1934 | 02/03/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D1254 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1936 | 20/05/1936 | 84 days | Rebuilding | Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1940 | 25/07/1940 | 32 days | General | Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1944 | 13/01/1945 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1947 | 12/09/1947 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1948 | 23/08/1948 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69885 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1950 | 13/05/1950 | 27 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24745 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1953 | 14/05/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1957 | 14/02/1957 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1957 | 08/06/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24738 (Diagram 63B) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/05/1959 | Class A8 4-6-2T (West Hartlepool) | All the locomotives of this class were noted stored during May viz.-Borough Gardens 69852/6/8/70, Darlington 69887, Saltburn 69869, Selby 69861, Sunderland 69850/3/4/5/7/9/73/4/5/8/83, Thornaby 69860, West Hartlepool 69867/77/85, York 69886. | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1921 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1526 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
10/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1923. Dep: 25/10/1923. | ||
03/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1924. Dep: 08/09/1924. | ||
13/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1926. Dep: 08/04/1926. | ||
06/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1928. Dep: 12/05/1928. | ||
04/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1929. Dep: 19/07/1929. | ||
15/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 23/05/1930. | ||
07/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1932. Dep: 21/04/1932. | ||
21/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1933. Dep: 25/08/1933. | ||
26/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1934. Dep: 02/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1254 (Diagram 63) |
||
24/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
27/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 27/02/1936. Dep: 20/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 116 (Diagram 63A) |
||
20/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
24/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1940. Dep: 25/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1293 (Diagram 63) |
||
06/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
08/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
01/08/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
11/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2375 (Diagram 63) |
||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9885 | ||
10/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947. | ||
26/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1948. Dep: 23/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2455 (Diagram 63A) Renumbered to BR 69885 |
||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 13/05/1950. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24745 (Diagram 63B) |
||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (50C) | ||
08/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
09/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. | ||
11/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 14/05/1953. | ||
27/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 27/06/1956. | ||
09/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
08/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1957. Dep: 14/02/1957. | ||
07/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24738 (Diagram 63B) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (50E) | ||
20/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69885 from Scarborough (50E) | ||
09/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |