Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 3954 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19566 Week
» 118211 Month
» 320875 Year
» 3347728 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
38 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3038 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5497 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
65497 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
J5 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Order Number |
260 |
Works Number |
1253 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/11/1953 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1909 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STV |
|
Staveley (G.C.) |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/11/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STV |
Staveley (G.C.) |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/11/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/07/1949 |
Derby Friargate MPD |
On 17/7 the following were noted at the ex G.N.R*. shed here, during the evening:-'D.2' Nos. 62172, 2173/77; 'D.3' No. 2123; 'J.5' Nos. 65484/85, 5497; 'J.6' No.4215; 'J.69' No. 8527. On this date, owing to extensive P.W. repairs on the ex L.M.S. line between Repton and Pear Tree Junction, involving a long section of single line working, certain ex L.M.S. trains from Burton to Derby were diverted via Dove Junction and Egginton over the ex G.N. line to Derby (with ex L.N.E.R. pilotmen from Egginton), passengers being conveyed from Derby (Friargate) to the ex L.M.S. station by omnibus. *The ex G.N. shed at Derby, the entrance to which is in Slack Lane (off Uttoxeter Old Road), is well worth a visit by members visiting the ex L.M.S. Works and Shed at Derby. |
SLS/194909 |
28/11/1953 |
Darlington Works |
North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 38 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3038 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5497 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65497 |
|
|
23/11/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65497 |
|
|