Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 856 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18659 Week
» 71675 Month
» 191202 Year
» 3218055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
557 |
m/e |
06/1913 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3557 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4206 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
64206 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt / N. Gresley |
Class |
J6 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
273 |
Works Number |
1392 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 06/1913 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 27/09/1960 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
3w/e |
02/07/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/09/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1940 |
Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1913 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 557 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1392 |
|
|
07/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3557 |
|
|
02/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4206 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Grantham (GRA) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64206 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
27/09/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64206 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|