Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 4299 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17705 Week
» 70721 Month
» 190248 Year
» 3217101 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
797 |
|
06/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5797 |
|
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5138 |
|
07/1946 |
British Railways |
65138 |
|
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3715 |
To Service |
During 06/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 08/08/1959 |
Service Life |
63 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 797 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3715 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5797 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5138 |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65138 |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65138 |
|
|