Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 160 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17963 Week
» 70979 Month
» 190506 Year
» 3217359 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
831 |
|
02/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5831 |
|
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5158 |
|
02/1946 |
British Railways |
65158 |
|
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3749 |
To Service |
During 02/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/12/1959 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1897 |
2F |
|
Market Harborough |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
2G |
Woodford Halse |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/09/1953 |
Northwich MPD |
The following Class J.10 0-6-0's were on the shed at 10 p.m., 65134, 65139, 65165, 65156, 65158, 65169 an 65202. Class D.10 4-4-0, 62659 Worsley Taylor, was at the end of No. 3 road, inside the shed minus her tender, with D.11, 62669 Ypres, on the adjoining road. Only one 'Super-D' (49435) was present. The balance of the inhabitants was made up of '8F's', a few Class 4 0-6-0's, a '3F' 0-6-0 and one N.5 0-6-2T, Number 69255. No O.4's were in evidence. Ex.G.C. 2-6-4 tank 69052 has returned to Northwich shed as from 20/9, having had a reprieve from scrapping. From 21/9, the whole of the working of limestone traffic between Tunstead and Northwich has been entrusted to Northwich shed, instead of being shared with Heaton Mersey. This will result in the saving of seven sets of men and nearly 1,500 miles of 'light engine' running annually. Three additional 8F's have been allocated to 9E for the new rosters. |
SLS/195311 |
17/05/1958 |
WoodfordMPD |
J10 65158 has replaced a J11 on local pilot duties. |
SLS/195807 |
21/03/1959 |
Woodford Halse MPD |
The Midland 3Fs (43330/89/94) are expected to go into store shortly-J10 65158 replaced 43394 for a short period but has gone back into store. 9Fs are now appearing regularly from Newport and Cardiff. |
SLS/195905 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 831 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3749 |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5831 |
|
|
02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5158 |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65158 |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Market Harborough (2F) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65158 |
|
|