Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3854 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17260 Week
» 70276 Month
» 189803 Year
» 3216656 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Central Railway |
839 |
|
03/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5839 |
|
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5164 |
|
03/1946 |
British Railways |
65164 |
|
24/07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
J10 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
3757 |
To Service |
During 03/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/05/1953 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Central Railway Number 839 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3757 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5839 |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5164 |
|
|
24/07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65164 |
|
|
08/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Ince (10F) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
03/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65164 |
|
|