Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 973 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6469 Week
» 25370 Month
» 25370 Year
» 1690746 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 978 m/e 09/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5978 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4285 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64285 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/109/1901
J11/4 (0-6-0)03/1943
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6040
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal Mon 04/08/1958
Service Life 56 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
36B Mexborough 4w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn on 04/08/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 04/08/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1943 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 978
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6040
   
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5978    
03/1943 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4285    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64285    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
04/08/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 64285    

prev prev