Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 580 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6191 Week
» 17237 Month
» 17237 Year
» 1682613 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 981 m/e 09/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5981 m/e 01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4288 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 64288 m/e 12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/109/1901
J11/4 (0-6-0)08/1935
J11/5 (0-6-0)12/1953
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6043
To Service During 09/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/11/1960
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1901
36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/03/1952
9G Northwich 8w/e 14/06/1952
35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 18/10/1952
38A Colwick 4w/e 25/09/1954
39A Gorton 5w/e 17/12/1955
   Withdrawn w/e 05/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/02/1952
LOAN 9G Northwich 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 03/12/1955
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 05/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1935 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1901 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 981
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6043
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5981    
08/1935 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4288    
12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 64288    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (9G)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
05/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 64288    

prev prev