Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 367 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5978 Week
» 17024 Month
» 17024 Year
» 1682400 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 987 m/e 12/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5987 m/e 05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4294 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 64294 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/112/1901
J11/4 (0-6-0)12/1929
J11/1 (0-6-0)05/1932
J11/4 (0-6-0)07/1934
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6049
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Sat 05/09/1959
Service Life 57 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
   Withdrawn on 05/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 14/08/1948
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   on 05/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1923 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 987
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6049
   
04/1923 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
05/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5987    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4294    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64294    
05/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64294    

prev prev