Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 208 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3597 Week
» 22498 Month
» 22498 Year
» 1687874 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 989 m/e 12/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5989 m/e 10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4296 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 64296 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/112/1901
J11/2 (0-6-0)03/1939
J11/5 (0-6-0)04/1941
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6051
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Mon 07/07/1958
Service Life 56 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/03/1952
36D Barnsley 4w/e 16/03/1957
   Withdrawn on 07/07/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   on 07/07/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1941 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 989
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6051
   
10/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5989    
04/1941 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4296    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64296    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
07/07/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 64296    

prev prev