Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 908 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 908 Week
» 19809 Month
» 19809 Year
» 1685185 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 990 m/e 12/1901
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5990 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4297 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 64297 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/112/1901
J11/4 (0-6-0)04/1937
J11/5 (0-6-0)04/1955
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6052
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Sat 20/06/1959
Service Life 57 yrs, 6 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1901
   Withdrawn on 20/06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   on 20/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1930 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 990
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6052
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5990    
02/1930 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4297    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 64297    
20/06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64297    

prev prev