Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 313 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5924 Week
» 16970 Month
» 16970 Year
» 1682346 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 997 m/e 03/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5997 m/e 01/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 4304 m/e 06/1946
British Railways 64304 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class J11
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J11/103/1902
J11/4 (0-6-0)05/1941
J11/5 (0-6-0)10/1948
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 6059
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/04/1959
Service Life 57 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1902
WAL Walton on the Hill on 05/01/1947
   Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WAL Walton on the Hill on 05/01/1947
ALLOC GOR Gorton on 09/04/1947
LOAN 39A Gorton on 02/11/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 11/04/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1915 Superheated boiler fitted
06/1922 Saturated Boiler Fitted
05/1941 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 997
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6059
   
04/1915 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1922 Modification Modification: Saturated boiler fitted    
01/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5997    
05/1941 Modification Modification: Superheated boiler fitted    
06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4304    
05/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (WAL)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 64304    
11/04/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 64304    

prev